Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rogoff-Klein, Inna) Mo/Compel Mo/Compel |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Trucking Olivas, LLC's Discovery Responses Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendant Trucking Olivas, LLC's Discovery Responses |
|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Notice Notice of Hearing |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Subpoena and Deposition by Written Questions Notice Notice of Subpoena and Deposition by Written Questions |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Subpoena and Deposition by Written Questions Notice Notice of Subpoena and Deposition by Written Questions |
|
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Designation of Lead Counsel and Notice of Appearance Designation Designation of Lead Counsel and Notice of Appearance |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Order Granting Defendant Trucking Olivas, LLC's Motion to Bifurcate Proceedings Order Granting Defendant Trucking Olivas, LLC's Motion to Bifurcate Proceedings |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Defendants Notice of Service of Controverting Affidavits under TCRP 18.001 Defendants Notice of Service of Controverting Affidavits under TCRP 18.001 |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) Other CANCELED Hearing (OCA) (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Rogoff-Klein, Inna) Other Mo/ Bifurcate Trial (20 minutes) |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant Jose Guadalupe Rodriguez's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition Defendant Jose Guadalupe Rodriguez's Original Answer to Plaintiffs' Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.