Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Carlos Valdez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarlos Valdez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 26, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Citation - Ablert Benge Chacon Citation - Ablert Benge Chacon |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation - Secretary of State Chacon, Albert Benge Served 09/27/2021 Response Due 10/25/2021 Returned 10/07/2021 | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation - Secretary of State Chacon, Albert Benge Unserved | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) Plaintiff's Original Petition Plaintiff's Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.