Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mcclain, Luke, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Nichols, Adam B, Nichols, Charles Ray, Stagg, Sedrick, against American Bottling Company, Guerrero, Randsom, Keurig Dr. Pepper, Inc., Splash Transport Inc., represented by Johnson, Kristie E, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales, Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal |
|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Entry of Judgment Order on Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Joint Motion for Dismissal with Prejudice |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Reporter's Certificate Oral And Videotaped Deposition Of Luke McClain |
|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Mediator's letter to court - Settled |
|
October 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Designation Plaintiffs' Notice of Designation Lead Counsel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.