Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Huizar, Mary, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Baskin, James D, Brooks, Scott Michael, against Constantine, Steven, Gonzales, Anthony Edward, Top Notch Movers Llc, represented by Rodriguez, Ralph M., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Woerner, Mark H. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWoerner, Mark H. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJanuary 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
October 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Hearing Cancellation Request |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Amended Agreed Docket Control Order |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Set Jury Trial and Entry Of A Docket Control Order |
|
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing on Plaintiff's Motion to Set Jury Trial and Entry Of A Docket Control Order |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order on Continuance Order Granting Agreed Motion for Continuance |
|
December 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Agreed Motion for Continuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.