Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Dube, Donna, Dube, Richard, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bavafa, Sam, Nichols, Charles Ray, Ozuna, Mariah A., against Driver, Unnamed, Langbecker, Lance, Live Oak Ready Mix, Llc, represented by Nelson, Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales, Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Docket Call Appear w/ZOOM |
|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Order on Continuance | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Agreed Motion for Continuance |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Defendants' Agreed Motion for Continuance |
|
October 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendants' Agreed Motion for Continuance |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Designation Plaintiffs' Expert Designation |
|
July 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) Plaintiff's Motion to Compel - Appear w/ZOOM |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion to Compel |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.