Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Root Insurance Company, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Peniche, Carlos, against Rodriguez, Jeannie, Rodriguez, Juanita, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 24, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment GRANTED |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
May 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
April 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Plaintiff's Notice Of Oral Hearing |
|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Plaintiff's Notice Of Reset Of Oral Hearing |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Oral Hearing |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Summary Judgment |
|
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Plaintiff's Original Petition (Amended) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.