Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Answer Defendant's First Amended Original Answer Defendant's First Amended Original Answer |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Court Advisory and Notice for Service of Documents and Data Court Advisory and Notice for Service of Documents and Data |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition Plaintiff's First Amended Original Petition |
|
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
September 21, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return Of Service - Rodolfo Ricardo Ramos Return Of Service - Rodolfo Ricardo Ramos |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Ramos, Rodolfo Ricardo Served 09/08/2021 Response Due 10/04/2021 Returned 09/13/2021 | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Ramos, Rodolfo Ricardo Unserved | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed Plaintiff S Original Petition Plaintiff S Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.