Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 12, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedAugust 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) () | |
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Daubert/Robinson Challenges | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) () | |
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event | File All Documents for Pre-Trial Conference | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Completion of Discovery | |
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event | Amendment of Pleadings | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Plaintiff's 1st Supplemental Designation Of Expert Witnesses Plaintiff's 1st Supplemental Designation Of Expert Witnesses |
|
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Plaintiff's 1st Supplemental Rule 902(10) Notice And 18.001 (d-2) Notice Of Service Of Affidavits Including Business Records And Medical Records Pertaining To Indira Herrero Plaintiff's 1st Supplemental Rule 902(10) Notice And 18.001 (d-2) Notice Of Service Of Affidavits Including Business Records And Medical Records Pertaining To Indira Herrero |
|
July 03, 2022 | Docket Event | Designation of Experts: Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.