Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Robert M. Galvan, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M. Galvan, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedNovember 16, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Galvan, Bobby) MTN. SUMMARY JUDGMENT Result: Held MTN. SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Summary Judgment Summary Judgment |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
|
May 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Designation of Andrew L. Smith as Attorney in Charge Designation Designation of Andrew L. Smith as Attorney in Charge |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Summary Judgment Summary Judgment |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Notice Of Hearing/Submission Notice Of Hearing/Submission |
|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion For Summary Judgment |
|
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Business Records Affidavit Notice Notice Of Business Records Affidavit |
|
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service - Diane Duran Return of Service - Diane Duran |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.