Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Carlos Valdez presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 29, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 08, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Valdez, Carlos) DEF. HRG.; VIA ZOOM ID 889 899 4182 DEF. HRG.; VIA ZOOM ID 889 899 4182 |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice Judgment Notice |
|
July 05, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of NonSuit (signed) Order (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) Order of NonSuit (signed) |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) Order of Nonsuit Order of Nonsuit |
|
July 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Nonsuit Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit Plaintiff's Notice of Nonsuit |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting | |
April 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Designation of Andrew L. Smith as Attorney in Charge Designation Designation of Andrew L. Smith as Attorney in Charge |
|
October 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer Defendant's Original Answer |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Valdez, Carlos ) Summary Judgment Summary Judgment |
|
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Motion Motion for Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.