Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Carlos Valdez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarlos Valdez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Regarding Deposition by Written Questions Directed to the Custodian of Records for: ADAME CHIROPRACTIC AND ACUPUNCTURE Pertaining to RICARDO REYNA, JR. Regarding Deposition by Written Questions Directed to the Custodian of Records for: ADAME CHIROPRACTIC AND ACUPUNCTURE Pertaining to RICARDO REYNA, JR. |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Letter Regarding Deposition by Written Questions Directed to the Custodian of Records for: ADAME CHIROPRACTIC AND ACUPUNCTURE - BILLING Pertaining to RICARDO REYNA, JR. Regarding Deposition by Written Questions Directed to the Custodian of Records for: ADAME CHIROPRACTIC AND ACUPUNCTURE - BILLING Pertaining to RICARDO REYNA, JR. |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Regarding Deposition by Written Questions Directed to the Custodian of Records for: VELA MEDICAL CENTER - BILLING Pertaining to RICARDO REYNA, JR. Regarding Deposition by Written Questions Directed to the Custodian of Records for: VELA MEDICAL CENTER - BILLING Pertaining to RICARDO REYNA, JR. |
|
September 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Regarding Deposition by Written Questions Directed to the Custodian of Records for: VELA MEDICAL CENTER Pertaining to RICARDO REYNA, JR. Regarding Deposition by Written Questions Directed to the Custodian of Records for: VELA MEDICAL CENTER Pertaining to RICARDO REYNA, JR. |
|
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Deposition Regarding Deposition by Written Questions Directed to the Custodian of Records for: RADIOLOGY & IMAGING OF SOUTH TEXAS - BILLING Pertaining to RICARDO REYNA, JR. Regarding Deposition by Written Questions Directed to the Custodian of Records for: RADIOLOGY & IMAGING OF SOUTH TEXAS - BILLING Pertaining to RICARDO REYNA, JR. |
|
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendants, Ohmstede Industrial Services, Inc. and William J. Harkins' Original Answer Defendants, Ohmstede Industrial Services, Inc. and William J. Harkins' Original Answer |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of service Ohmstede LTD Return of service Ohmstede LTD |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service Ohmatede Industrial Services Inc Return of Service Ohmatede Industrial Services Inc |
|
June 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Affidavit and Citation- Ohmstede Industrial Affidavit and Citation- Ohmstede Industrial |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.