Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with David V. Stith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid V. Stith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant s Original Answer Defendant s Original Answer |
|
July 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service - Guadalupe Jimenez Return of Service - Guadalupe Jimenez |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed (Judicial Officer: Stith, David ) Plaintiff S Original Petition Plaintiff S Original Petition |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Jimenez, Guadalupe Served 07/02/2021 Response Due 07/26/2021 Returned 07/07/2021 | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Jimenez, Guadalupe Unserved |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.