Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with David V. Stith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid V. Stith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2021 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Affidavits Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Affidavits |
|
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Citation - Daniel Luehrs - 333 Citation - Daniel Luehrs - 333 |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant Daniel Luethrs's Original Answer Defendant Daniel Luethrs's Original Answer |
|
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter for Original Answer for Original Answer |
|
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Luehrs, Daniel Served 08/18/2021 Response Due 09/13/2021 Returned 08/25/2021 | |
June 17, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Luehrs, Daniel Unserved | |
June 16, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid | |
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed (Judicial Officer: Stith, David ) Plaintiff'S Original Petition Plaintiff'S Original Petition |
|
June 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.