Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Jack W. Pulcher presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJack W. Pulcher Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2021 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedOctober 21, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Pulcher, Jack W.) DEFAULT HEARING DEFAULT HEARING |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Pulcher, Jack W. ) Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice Of Hearing Notice Of Hearing |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Designation of Attorney Designation Designation of Attorney |
|
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Pulcher, Jack W. ) Order Setting Hearing Order Setting Hearing |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Pulcher, Jack W. ) Default Judgment Default Judgment |
|
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment |
|
November 18, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return Of service/Citation- David Meza-1 Return Of service/Citation- David Meza-1 |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order for Sub Service Order (Judicial Officer: Pulcher, Jack W. ) Order for Sub Service |
|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Pulcher, Jack W. ) Order for Substituted Service Order for Substituted Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.