Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with David V. Stith presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid V. Stith Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 10, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Subpoena Bay, Inc. Served 08/02/2021 Returned 08/04/2021 | |
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event | Subpoena | |
July 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Amended Supoena Request Amended Supoena Request |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order To Issue Subpoena Order (Judicial Officer: Stith, David ) Order To Issue Subpoena |
|
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Stith, David) MTN FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTER ROGATORY MTN FOR ISSUANCE OF LETTER ROGATORY |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Subpoena Request - Nueces County Subpoena Request - Nueces County |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Stith, David ) Order Order |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Notice of Deposition Notice of Deposition |
|
June 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed (Judicial Officer: Stith, David ) Petition For Issuance Of Letter Rogatory Petition For Issuance Of Letter Rogatory |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.