Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStith, David Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Stith, David) (Set by Judge) (Set by Judge) |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Stith, David) MTN TO ENFORCEMENT MTN TO ENFORCEMENT |
|
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service/Show Cause-Rosaura Pineda Rodriguez Casares-served1 Return of Service/Show Cause-Rosaura Pineda Rodriguez Casares-served1 |
|
October 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return Of Service Notice of Hearing to Show Cause/served-1 Return Of Service Notice of Hearing to Show Cause/served-1 |
|
October 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Show Cause Rodriguez Casares, Rosaura Pineda Served 10/26/2022 Returned 10/27/2022 | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service/Citation-Rosaura Oineda Rodriguez Casares-served1 Return of Service/Citation-Rosaura Oineda Rodriguez Casares-served1 |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Stith, David) MTN FOR ENFORCEMENT (1HR) piggy backing behind 2021FAM3415G MTN FOR ENFORCEMENT (1HR) piggy backing behind 2021FAM3415G |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting | |
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing Notice of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.