Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Robert M. Galvan, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobert M. Galvan, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 18, 2020 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedAugust 03, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 02, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Galvan, Bobby) MTN. SUMMARY JUDGMENT MTN. SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
May 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Summary Judgment Summary Judgment |
|
March 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant Samuel Orozco, Jr's Original Answer to Plaintiff Well Fargo Bank, N.A.'S Petition Defendant Samuel Orozco, Jr's Original Answer to Plaintiff Well Fargo Bank, N.A.'S Petition |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service- Samuel Orozco Return of Service- Samuel Orozco |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Orozco, Samuel, Jr. Served 01/23/2021 Response Due 02/15/2021 Returned 01/25/2021 | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed (Judicial Officer: Galvan, Bobby ) Plaintiff'S Original Petition Plaintiff'S Original Petition |
|
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
December 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.