Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Stonewater Properties Usa, Inc., filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Woellner, Andrew A, against Chubb Custom Insurance Company, General Security Indemnity Company Of Arizona, Leverenz, Nathan, Starr Surplus Lines Insurance Company, represented by Wallingford, Brett A, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2020 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedNovember 02, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (9:00 AM) () (Pre the parites email on 9/13/22, the case has settled in mediation.) 05/02/2022 Reset by Court to 11/01/2022 (Pre the parites email on 9/13/22, the case has settled in mediation.) |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) Agreed Resolution CANCELED Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Medary, Missy) Agreed Resolution (Pre the parites email on 9/13/22, the case has settled in mediation.) 04/21/2022 Reset by Court to 10/20/2022 |
|
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Other CANCELED Settlement Conference (9:00 AM) () Other 03/17/2022 Reset by Court to 09/15/2022 |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Letter Email correspondence - Parties have reached agreement Email correspondence - Parties have reached agreement |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) () | |
April 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Medary, Missy) | |
April 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting JT: 11/01/2022 9am PreTrial: 10/20/2022 9am Settlement Conference: 09/15/2022 9am JT: 11/01/2022 9am PreTrial: 10/20/2022 9am Settlement Conference: 09/15/2022 9am |
|
March 31, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Granting Agreed Motion For Continuance Order (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Order Granting Agreed Motion For Continuance |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Medary, Missy ) Order Granting Agreed Motion for Continuance Order Granting Agreed Motion for Continuance |
|
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Continuance Agreed Motion For Continuance Agreed Motion For Continuance |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.