Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRogoff-Klein, Inna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Decree |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Rogoff-Klein, Inna) Entry of Judgment (Zoom) Entry of Judgment (Zoom) |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Mediation for Settlement Agreement Mediated Settlement Agreement Mediated Settlement Agreement |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Written Discovery Petitioner's Certificate of Written Discovery Directed To Respondent Petitioner's Certificate of Written Discovery Directed To Respondent |
|
August 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition First Amended Petition To Modify Parent-Child Relationship First Amended Petition To Modify Parent-Child Relationship |
|
June 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Return of Service/Citation-Elizabeth May Wood Return of Service/Citation-Elizabeth May Wood |
|
June 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Citation Wood, Elizabeth May Served 06/10/2022 Response Due 07/04/2022 Returned 06/14/2022 | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event | Nueces County Standing Order | |
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested Service Requested |
|
May 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify-Custody (OCA) (Judicial Officer: Rogoff-Klein, Inna ) Petition To Modify Parent-Child Relationship Petition To Modify Parent-Child Relationship |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.