Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sheth, Bansuri Nitin, filed a(n) Name Change - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 10, 2020 |
CategoryChange Of Name - Adult |
Last RefreshedNovember 05, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeName Change |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Of Judgment |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Changing The Name of An Adult | |
September 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
September 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Criminal search result |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Petition to Change the Name of an Adult |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Changing the Name of an Adult |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.