Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Navy Army Community Credit Union, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Barre, Denny, against Hampton, Helen, Mcelhenney, Michael D, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Pulcher, Jack W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 23, 2019 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession |
|
April 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession | |
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Request Writ of Possession |
|
January 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
December 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Final Judgment |
|
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing DEFAULT HEARING |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendants, Helen Hampton and Michael D. McelHenney |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Certificate of Last Known Address |
|
November 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Non Military Affidavit - Michael McElhenney |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.