Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Deceptive Trade Practices - Consumer case represented by Anaele, Mildred, against Bowman, Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Valdez, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2019 |
CategoryDeceptive Trade Practice |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDeceptive Trade Practices |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) MSJ |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summary Judgment signed |
|
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
September 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing/Submission |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Summary Judgment |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
April 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendant's Answer |
|
March 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Citation - Thomas Bowman |
|
February 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.