Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Pronske, Thomas, against Saldana, Monica S, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Pulcher, Jack W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2019 |
CategoryConsumer/Commercial/Debt |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Noticed of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT (15 MIN) |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Summary Judgment |
|
September 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting | |
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing/Submission |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Summary Judgment |
|
August 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Citation - Monica S Saldana |
|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
February 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.