Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Zamindari Real Estate Investment One, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case represented by Brodeur, Mark C., Partridge, Jack C., against Fedex Freight, Inc., represented by De Los Santos, Eddy L., Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Pulcher, Jack W. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePulcher, Jack W. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2019 |
CategoryLandlord/Tenant |
Last RefreshedNovember 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Call | |
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) Requested 15minutes |
|
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) No Evidence for Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Plaintiff Zamindari's Response to FedEx's MSJ |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Fedex Freight Inc's No Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Mtn for Summary Judgment 11/02/23 @1:00 PM ZOOM ID: 699 880 2702 |
|
October 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant FedEx Freight Inc.'s No Evidence Motion for Summary Judgment |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting DC: 04/04/24 @ 11 AM JT: 04/15/24 @ 9 AM Zoom ID: 699 880 2702 |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Control Order | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Docket Control Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.