Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cruz, Irma, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Toscano, Andrew E., against Rodriguez, Elvia, represented by Fancher, Rick, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMedary, Missy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 12, 2019 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) () | |
October 05, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Certificate of Deposition, Corpus Christi Independent School District, (Academic) Certificate of Deposition, Corpus Christi Independent School District, (Academic) |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) (9:00 AM) () 09/14/2020 Reset by Court to 09/24/2020 | |
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Certificate of Deposition, Corpus Christi Independent School District, (Academic) |
|
September 24, 2020 | Docket Event | Pre-Trial Hearing (OCA) | |
September 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Daubert/Robinson Challenges | |
September 20, 2020 | Docket Event | Daubert/Robinson Challenges | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | File All Documents for Pre-Trial Conference | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | File All Documents for Pre-Trial Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.