Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Welch, Tristan Jean, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Parker, Cory Ray, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 29, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Z - Notice of Change of Payee (AG) Notice of Attorney General as Necessary Party and Change of Payee |
|
November 14, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
October 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service of Citation |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Employer's Order to Withold From Earnings for Child Support |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Service Request Information Sheet | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.