Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Nanette Hasette presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Docket (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hasette, Nanette) Dismissal for Want of Prosecution Result: Held Dismissal for Want of Prosecution |
|
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Notice of Setting - November 16, 2022 @ 9am Notice of Setting - November 16, 2022 @ 9am |
|
October 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Dismissal for WAnt of Prosecution November 16, 2022 @ 9am Dismissal for WAnt of Prosecution November 16, 2022 @ 9am |
|
October 21, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Final Divorce Hearing: 11/14/19 @ 9AM Final Divorce Hearing: 11/14/19 @ 9AM |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Waiver of Service Waiver Waiver of Service |
|
October 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce Original Petition for Divorce |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet No Service Requested No Service Requested |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Current Address Notice Notice of Current Address |
|
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order (Judicial Officer: Hasette, Nanette ) Final Decree of Divorce Final Decree of Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.