Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Erebia, Jennet, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Erebia, Mario Francisco, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 19, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
September 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
August 21, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.