Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Butts, Kayla Denise, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Butts, Justin Allen, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
April 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders and Order to Appear |
|
March 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Amended Petition First Amended Petition For Divorce |
|
March 11, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet No Service Requested |
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce |
|
February 27, 2019 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.