Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Saldana, Ventura, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Saldana, Crystal F, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Galvan, Bobby presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Order - Employer's Order of Withholding | |
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Amended Income Withholding Order |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order FINAL DECREE OF DIVORCE |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice OF JUDGMENT |
|
December 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Entry of Judgment | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing / Setting | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree Of Divorce |
|
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion For Entry Of Final Judgment | |
November 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Agreement Mediated Settlement Agreement |
|
October 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order 2ND AMENDED ORDER HOLDING VENTURA SALDANA IN CONTEMPT FOR FAILURE TO PAY CHILD SUPPORT AND SPOUSAL SUPPORT,GRANTING JDUGMENT FOR ARREARAGES AND SUSPENDING COMMITMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.