Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ortiz, Alyssa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Ortiz, Andres, Jr., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRogoff-Klein, Inna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment |
|
September 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
September 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) default |
|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment |
|
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Protective Order Signed (OCA) | |
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Protective Order |
|
August 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter Letter to Court 08-03-2020 |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) Protective Order 30min |
|
July 17, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Petitioner's Evidence List |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.