Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Linan, Felicia, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Cason, Benny M., against Villarreal, Pete, represented by Delgado, Antoinette V., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Agreed Judgment Judgment |
|
August 21, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) FRIENDLY SUIT |
|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event |
Final Hearing FRIENDLY SUIT |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order of Appointment Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem -Abel Herrero |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion Joint Motion To Appoint Guardian Ad Litem |
|
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Defendants Original Answer |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Original Petition (OCA) | |
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Jury Fee Paid |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.