Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Myles, Loretta, Myles, Marcus Cortez, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Hopkins, Josh W., against National Oilwell Varco Lp, Sanchez, Marcus Robert, represented by Hood, Kevin L., in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Gonzales, Lisa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGonzales, Lisa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2017 |
CategoryInjury Or Damage - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedNovember 14, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal |
|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail amended dwop notice - Kevin L. Hood |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail dwop notice for Kevin L. Hood |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
DWOP Notice Sent amended |
|
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | DWOP Notice Sent | |
July 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Call |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.