Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Ortiz, John Anthony, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Ayala, Joany, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Valdez, Carlos presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeValdez, Carlos Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryParent/Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) Bench Trial (Half-Day) |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) Bench Trial (Half-Day) |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Inability to Pay Statement Of Inability To Afford pAyment Of Court Cost Or An Appeal Bond |
|
August 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) Bench Trial (Half-Day) |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Court Proceeding | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) Mo/Withdraw (Unopposed by Steve Lopez) (Zoom) |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Order For Withdrawal of Attorney- Celeste Robertson | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw Motion For Withdrawal Of Attorney |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order For Withdrawal Of Attorney |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Jury Trial |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.