Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Zuniga, Jon, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Valenzuela, Alexis, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRogoff-Klein, Inna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
May 17, 2018 | Docket Event |
Order Agreed Final Decree of Divorce |
|
May 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Agreed Final Decree Of Divorce |
|
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Z - Intervention (AG) Intervention |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event | Letter | |
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Temporary Orders |
|
January 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) TEMP ORDERS 30 MINS |
|
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Citation - Alexis Valenzuela |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Show Cause | |
January 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Setting Hearing for Temporary Orders |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.