Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Nueces County, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Linebarger Goggan Blair &Amp; Sampson, Llp, against Balboa, Beverly, Balboa, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2017 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal by Plaintiff/Nonsuit/Non-Final Order for Nonsuit |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Cover Letter for Motion for Non-Suit | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion for Nonsuit | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order for Non-Suit |
|
December 07, 2018 | Docket Event |
Attorney Correspondence Court Cost Letter |
|
January 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Citation NPDC |
|
December 29, 2017 | Docket Event |
Cover Letter With Service Instructions |
|
December 15, 2017 | Docket Event |
Original Petition Documents E-filed Original Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.