Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Danelian, Lulu, Powers, Lulu, Powers, Lulu Beston, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Augenstein, Amie, against Hicks, Charles A, represented by Barre, Denny, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRogoff-Klein, Inna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 27, 2017 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event |
Mandate Letter from COA: The appeal was dismissed by court. Mandate enclosed. |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Release Notice of Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
May 25, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Enclosed please find the opinion & judgment issued by court |
|
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Appeal |
|
May 10, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Appeal |
|
May 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter Bill of Cost emailed to attorney |
|
April 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Letter from COA: The appellant's notice of appeal was filed |
|
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appeal Plaintiff's Notice of Appeal |
|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice judgment notice |
|
March 21, 2018 | Docket Event | Order Denying Petition for Equitable Bill of Review |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.