Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Martinez, Michelle Denise, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lozano, Michael Flores, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 19, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin Vitals Form for Divorce Decree Signed 04/13/18 |
|
May 15, 2018 | Docket Event |
Z - Notice of Change of Payee (AG) Notice of Attorney General as Necessary Party and Change of Payee |
|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Judgment - Agreed Judgment Final Decree of Divorce |
|
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
April 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and or Dismissal | |
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Final Divorce Hearing -- April 13,2018 @ 9:30am |
|
February 12, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Final Hearing - March 29,2018 @ 9am |
|
February 08, 2018 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
January 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 19, 2017 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.