Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hicks, Charles A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Barre, Denny, against Danelian, Lulu, represented by Pratt, Amie, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRogoff-Klein, Inna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2016 |
CategoryWrit Of Garnishment After Judgment |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2018 | Docket Event |
Notice judgment notice |
|
June 06, 2018 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal | |
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order of Dismissal |
|
May 30, 2018 | Docket Event |
Motion to Dismiss Motion for Dismissal |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) Protective Order |
|
October 12, 2017 | Docket Event | Order that Status Quo Remains in this Case (signed) | |
February 06, 2017 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Executed Writ of Garnishment |
|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Defendant's Motion to Dissolve Writ |
|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Dissolving Writ of Garnishment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.