Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Kaspar, Carolyn Michelle, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Kaspar, Michael Andrew, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Medary, Missy presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 29, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin BVS Form & Order signed 11/22/2016 |
|
February 03, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Domestic Relations Order |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Letter to Court 01-25-17 | |
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Domestic Relations Order |
|
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
November 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
October 31, 2016 | Docket Event |
Settlement Agreement Mediated Settlement Agreement |
|
October 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Docket Control Conference | |
October 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Docket Control Conference 10/19/16 @ 10am |
|
September 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion for Enforcement of Temporary Orders by Contempt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.