Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hawthorne, William Douglas, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Hawthorne, Debera Kay, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin BVS Form for Order Signed on 12/28/2016 |
|
January 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgmen and/or Dismissal | |
December 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Amended Final Decree of Divorce |
|
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Letter Cancelling Final Hearing | |
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Qualified Domestic Relations Order Relation to the Assignment of a Portion of the Accrued Benefits of William Douglas Hawthorne Under the Citgo Petroleum Corporation Salaried Employees' Pension Plan |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Domestic Relations Order Dividing Retirement Plan Benefits |
|
December 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Qualified Domestic Relations Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.