Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Williams, Christine Robinson, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Williams, Tommy, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2016 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Returned Mail Notice of Judgemt |
|
August 13, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment And/Or Dismissal | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Protective Order Signed (OCA) Agreed Protective Order |
|
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
July 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Application for Protective Order (Notice) | |
July 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order - Ex-Parte Order Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order & Order Setting Hearing 8/10 @ 1:30 PM |
|
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application An Application For A Protective Order |
|
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Application Identifier |
|
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order and Order Setting Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.