Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Saenz, Maria Yolanda, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Saenz, Carlos F, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Hasette, Nanette presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHasette, Nanette Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 31, 2017 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal for Want of Prosecution | |
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
August 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
DWOP Notice Sent Court's Own Motion and Notice of Hearing for Dismissal of Want of Prosecution |
|
August 24, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order to Transfer - Court to Court Order of Transfer (to 28th district court) |
|
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce |
|
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Indigency | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet No Service Requested |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.