Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sepeda, Rodolfo, Jr., filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Perez, Monica Mendoza, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Pulcher, Jack W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2016 |
CategoryParent/Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Hearing (OCA) Capias w/$1,000.00 CB |
|
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event | Capias | |
February 07, 2020 | Docket Event |
Z - Order (AG) Order for Issuance of Capias |
|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Hearing (OCA) ENMC - NEW |
|
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Z - Affidavit of Service CP Served |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Z - Officer's Return NCP Citation Served |
|
January 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Z - Officer's Return NCP Precept Served |
|
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Citation | |
December 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Precept | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Z - Order (AG) Order to Appear and Show Cause 2/5/20 @ 8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.