Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Sikes, Ashley M, filed a(n) Other Parent-Child - Family case against Goodwin, Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 31, 2016 |
CategoryParent/Child Relationship |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeOther Parent-Child |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
September 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Orders (1HR) |
|
August 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
August 16, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondent's Original Answer |
|
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Show Cause - Stephen Goodwin |
|
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Citation - Stephen Goodwin |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation | |
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing / Setting Notice of Hearing for Temporary Orders 7/25 @ 1:30 PM |
|
July 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Show Cause |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.