Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Malcolm, Bruce Lee, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Malcolm, Christy Louise, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 27, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin BVS Form & Order signed 08/05/2016 |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
July 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Waiver Of Service |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event | Pro Se Notice | |
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet No Service |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form | |
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition For Divorce |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.