Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Manyeki, Agnes Wangui, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Davis, Michael Steven, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Pulcher, Jack W. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 26, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2017 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin BVS Form for Order Signed on 08/19/2016 |
|
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Judgment and/or Dismissal | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | FINAL HEARING | |
August 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Answer Respondant's Original Answer |
|
August 15, 2016 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service Only (Specific Waiver) | |
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Certificate Certifcate of last Known Address |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Original Petition (OCA) Original Petition for Divorce |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
May 26, 2016 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.