Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lopez, Rosa Rodriguez, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Lopez, David H, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Watts, Sandra L. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 25, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2016 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin BVS for Order Signed 08/10/2016 |
|
August 12, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice Judgment Notice |
|
August 11, 2016 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
August 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order Decree of Divorce |
|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Original Answer | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation | |
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Inability to Pay | |
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Service Request Information Sheet Service Requested |
|
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Family Case Information Sheet | |
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.