Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lopez, Janie Ann, filed a(n) Domestic Violence - Family case against Lopez, Jose Rogelio, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Stith, David presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2016 |
CategoryProtective Order |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDomestic Violence |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Dismissal Docket | |
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) P.O. |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event |
Order - Ex-Parte Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order 3/21 @ 1:30 PM |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice TCIC form |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Hearing (OCA) P.O. |
|
February 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
February 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order for 02/18/16 @1:30pm | |
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion to Extend Temporary Ex Parte Protective Order | |
February 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Order Extending Ex Parte Protective Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.