Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gonzalez, Aaron Beltram, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Montalvo, Victoria Nina, in the jurisdiction of Nueces County, TX, . Nueces County, TX Superior Courts with Rogoff-Klein, Inna presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRogoff-Klein, Inna Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNueces County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2017 | Docket Event |
Forms Mailed to Austin BVS for Order Signed 04/11/2017 |
|
May 02, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice judgment notice |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Final Decree of Divorce |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Parent Education Certificate Filed Aaron Gonzalez |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Parent Education Certificate Filed Victoria Montalvo |
|
April 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
April 10, 2017 | Docket Event | Final Hearing | |
February 20, 2017 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Final Decree Of Divorce |
|
January 25, 2017 | Docket Event | Waiver of Service | |
December 14, 2016 | Docket Event | BVS Acceptance Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.